Financial history THE VISCOUNTESS RADCLIFFE FUND

Charity number: 289134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.01k £2.34k £825 £883 £1.16k
Total expenditure £1.00k £0 £1.50k £2.00k £150
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A