THE HYPERTENSION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to individual involved in research into Hypertension.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 March 1984: Standard registration
- 05 April 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- THE HYPERTENSION TRUST (Working name)
- ISH 1996 (Previous name)
- THE HYPERTENSION SOCIETY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38 | £7 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.53k | £27.23k | £7.05k | £1.31k | £1.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 23 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 01 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 28 November 2013 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH JANUARY 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE STUDIES AND KNOWLEDGE OF ARTERIAL HYPERTENSION AND RELATED VASCULAR DISEASES AND THEIR PATHOPHYSIOLOGY, EPIDERMIOLOGY, DETECTION, INVESTIGATION AND TREATMENT, AND TO PUBLISH STUDIES AND MATERIAL ON THOSE SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window