OLD KILN MUSEUM TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust operates a country life museum, the Rural Life Centre, to educate and entertain the public in matters relating to farming, crafts and rural living.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 April 1984: Standard registration
- 30 January 2025: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 30 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1200370 OLD KILN MUSEUM CIO
- RURAL LIFE CENTRE (Working name)
- Rural Life Living Museum (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250.67k | £250.67k | £276.26k | £245.14k | £298.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £230.35k | £237.80k | £187.63k | £301.79k | £313.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.35k | N/A | £141.57k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 9 DECEMBER 2005, DEED OF SUBSTITUTION DATED 9 AUGUST 2006 AND DEED OF SUBSTITUTION DATED 27 NOVEMBER 2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF AN AGRICULTURAL MUSEUM COMPRISING SUCH EXHIBITS OR ITEMS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE COMPRISED IN THE FUND AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME AS A COLLECTION ("THE COLLECTION").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window