THE FINCHCOCKS CHARITY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop the resources of the Finchcocks Musical Museum by the promotion of musical education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 03 August 1984: Standard registration
- THE FINCHCOCKS CHARITY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Crane | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIR CHARLES BURNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATRINA EVELINE BURNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.87k | £11.49k | £110.31k | £136.13k | £54.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.27k | £22.13k | £38.86k | £66.50k | £89.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6 DECEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICAL KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THORUGH EDUCATION AND THE PERFORMANCE OF MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND OTHER MATERIAL SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO SCHOLARS AND OTHERS SEEKING TO IMPROVE THIER KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC AND MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Frant Road
Tunbridge Wells
TN2 5LE
- Phone:
- 01892523203
- Email:
- katrina@finchcocks.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window