Financial history THE CARRON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 289164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £16.40k £2.00k £10.00k £0 £0
Total expenditure £18.70k £1.15k £1.15k £5.30k £2.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A