DAWATUL ISLAM UK AND EIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes Education/training Prevention or relief of poverty Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 April 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhammad Abdur Rahman | Chair | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
KHALILUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Farid Ahmed Reza | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Kamal Uddin Ahmed | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Arman Ali | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Abdullah Muhammad Rafiqul Islam | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Shabbir Ahmad Kawsar | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Abul Hasanat Mohammed Shahid Chowdhury | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Forida Haque | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Ahmed Abdul Malik | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Mukit | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mafruha Khatoon | Trustee | 11 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARFATH ALI | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|||||
ABU SAYEED | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
HASAN MUHAMMAD MUEENUDDIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.35m | £1.51m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.16m | £1.18m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £69.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £283.31k | £324.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £895.27k | £1.04m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £94.01k | £95.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £76.28k | £53.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.05m | £1.06m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £71.34k | £76.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £52.14k | £22.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £43.24k | £45.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH JANUARY 1982 AS AMENDED ON 1ST JANUARY 1984, 11TH AUGUST 1984, 10TH AND 11TH AUGUST 1985, 29TH NOVEMBER 1987, 21ST MAY 1988, 31ST DECEMBER 1989, 22ND JANUARY 1995 AND 19TH OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM AND ITS TEACHINGS, PRACTICES AND VALUES PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH HOLDING PRAYER MEETINGS, RITUALS AND CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING FACILITIES FOR RAISING AWARENESS AND BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF ISLAM IN ORDER TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY COHESION IN SOCIETY; THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY GLOBALLY WHERE NEEDED BY PROVIDING OR SUPPORTING EDUCATIONAL, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE, AND OTHER DEVELOPMENT PROJECTS TO EMPOWER INDIVIDUALS TO BE SELF-DEPENDANT; AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED MUSLIM COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DARUL UMMAH
56 BIGLAND STREET
LONDON
E1 2ND
- Phone:
- 02077905166
- Email:
- info@dawatul-islam.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window