Financial history THE COLCHESTER COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS, SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 289222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £58.38k £63.85k £71.01k £93.98k £234.82k
Total expenditure £32.79k £20.50k £47.03k £70.00k £54.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A