Governance FRIENDS OF FRAMINGHAM EARL HIGH SCHOOL
Charity number: 289224
Removed charity
Registration history:
- 24 May 1984: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 November 2009: Standard registration
- 09 February 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 February 2012: Re-registered
- 09 February 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- FRAMINGHAM EARL PARENT/TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.