THE NICHOLAS BACON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 289228
Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the charity is to make grants out of income for charitable, educational and humanitarian causes at the discretion of the trustees. The preferred areas for payment of grants are for youth education, medical research and for the protection of the environment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £26,500

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 April 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leslie Tobin Bacon Chair 12 March 2002
None on record
Max Bacon Trustee 29 December 2014
None on record
Cedric Brandt Trustee 25 October 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £8.65k £6.89k £5.73k £5.19k £0
Total expenditure £60.83k £40.13k £30.05k £20.00k £26.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 21 March 2023 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 YORK TERRACE WEST
LONDON
NW1 4QA
Phone:
02079377305
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available