BJU INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 289273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's main objectives are the advancement and improvement of education in urology, men's health and related areas and the diffusion of knowledge of new and improved methods of teaching and practising urology, men's health and related areas. Activities include publishing BJU International and other scientific and learned works and other educational activity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 April 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BRITISH JOURNAL OF UROLOGY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Mumba Chalwe Trustee 28 March 2025
None on record
Dr SARAH ITAM Trustee 11 July 2024
BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF BLACK SURGEONS
Received: On time
Brian Duggan Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Maxine Tran Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Dr Andrew Robinson Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Dr Stephen Mark Trustee 31 July 2021
None on record
Sunjay Jain Trustee 12 July 2021
None on record
Innes McKeand Trustee 12 July 2021
None on record
Dr Peggy Sau-Kwan CHU Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
John Samuel McGrath Trustee 25 June 2018
None on record
Dr David Colin Winkle Trustee 26 June 2017
None on record
Stuart Alan McNeill Trustee 16 October 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.20m £1.45m £1.11m £1.06m £1.11m
Total expenditure £1.15m £1.04m £1.04m £1.03m £992.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.15m £1.40m £1.09m £1.05m £1.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £48.79k £47.53k £13.12k £3.11k £19.61k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £820.27k £1.04m £1.04m £1.03m £992.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.63k £1.18k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £66.91k £22.59k £9.38k £23.21k £36.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £61.22k £32.75k £23.30k £89.83k £51.27k
Expenditure - Investment management £2.63k £1.18k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £324.09k £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.25m £1.26m £1.25m £1.25m £1.24m
Long-term investments £1.60m £1.71m £2.00m £1.80m £2.04m
Other assets £775.91k £1.26m £1.15m £1.22m £1.31m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £155.26k £236.71k £61.15k £91.43k £66.94k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 JUNCTION MEWS
LONDON
W2 1PN
Phone:
02077060177
Website:

bjui.org