Accounts and annual returns KEYNSHAM AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 289291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 08 February 2024 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 08 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 18 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required