KIMPTON PARISH CHURCH RESTORATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise and apply funds for the restoration expenditure incurred by the Parish Church of Kimpton, Hertfordshire, through the Vicar and Churchwardens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £8,858 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 11 May 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Elizabeth Chilton Guest | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Quentin Wade | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Baldwin | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John Henry Cole | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE WILLIAM MITCHELL | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES EDWARD FRITH | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|||||
JOHN HENRY WILLIAM PEPPER | Trustee | 13 April 2000 |
|
|
||||
CARINA ELIZABETH HELMN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE JULIET ELIZABETH MORTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.42k | £1.44k | £32.15k | £20.43k | £24.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.06k | £338 | £7.92k | £85.30k | £26.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.01k | N/A | £254 | N/A | £8.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH APRIL 1984 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 9TH NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
1. THE RESTORATION, REPAIR AND UPKEEP OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, KIMPTON INCLUDING PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT TO COMPLY WITH STATUTORY REQUIREMENTS. 2. THE PROVISION, RESTORATION AND REPAIR OF MONUMENTS, ORNAMENT, FURNISHINGS, ORGAN, WINDOWS AND OTHER EMBELLISHMENTS AND DQUIPMENT OF THE CHURCH. 3. SUCH ORTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE CHURCH AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TALLENTS
KIMPTON BOTTOM
KIMPTON
HITCHIN
SG4 8EU
- Phone:
- 01438832719
- Email:
- john.pepper20@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window