Financial history The Arts Society Henley

Charity number: 289323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £31.75k £34.65k £45.48k £46.77k £47.51k
Total expenditure £27.71k £26.94k £50.58k £38.76k £43.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A