Governing document The Arts Society Henley

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS AMENDED 5 APRIL 1984, 7 APRIL 1994 AND 11 APRIL 1996 as amended on 01 Apr 2015 as amended on 03 Apr 2019 as amended on 03 Apr 2019 as amended on 04 Nov 2020 as amended on 08 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
(I) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE VISUAL ARTS AND TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND THE KNOWLEDGE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE VISUAL ARTS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF HENLEY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD. (II) ALSO, TO SECURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN HENLEY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
HENLEY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.