WYTHAM HALL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are: 1)The provision of assistance and in particular residential care for men and women who through poverty, homelessness or age cannot readily obtain such care and 2)To promote,undertake and sponsor research into the special needs of the poor, the homeless and the aged and 3)The training and education of medical students
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £71,196 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 08 May 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARETH AUSTIN-JONES | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Fish | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SIR BRIAN JARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER GERARD BARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PHILIP REID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £279.18k | £290.13k | £396.06k | £315.10k | £316.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £406.60k | £323.92k | £414.43k | £324.25k | £367.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £64.70k | £64.70k | £64.70k | £64.70k | £71.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSCOATION INCORPORATED 13TH DECEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
(I) THE PROVISION AT WYTHAM HALL AND ELSE-WHERE WITHIN THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER AND IN CENTRAL LONDON OF FREE MEDICAL ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR RESIDENTIAL CARE FOR MEN AND WOMEN WHO THROUGH POVERTY, HOMELESSNESS OR AGE CANNOT READILY OBTAIN SUCH CARE AND; (II) TO PROMOTE UNDERTAKE AND SPONSOR RESEARCH INTO THE SPECIAL MEDICAL NEEDS OF THE POOR THE HOMELESS AND THE AGED IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE NATURE AND STANDARD OF THE SUPPORT GIVEN TO SUCH PERSONS, AND (III) THE TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT ONLY IN CONNECTION WITH SUCH MATTERS OF MEDICAL STUDENTS AND PERSONS INTENDING TO BECOME MEDICAL STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
117 SUTHERLAND AVENUE
LONDON
W9 2QJ
- Phone:
- 02072891978
- Email:
- enquiries@wythamhall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window