Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH, UP MARDEN

Charity number: 289333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £451.75k £55.91k £26.04k £2.78k £3.63k
Total expenditure £3.12k £4.44k £6.74k £19.11k £3.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A