FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH, UP MARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raises money for the maintenance of the fabric of St Michael's Church Up Marden.. Additionally to promote religious ,cultural, historic and charitable works to encourage interest in the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- West Sussex
Governance
- 03 July 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
URSULA WESTMACOTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Timothy Huxham | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ABLEWHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE SEDDON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £451.75k | £55.91k | £26.04k | £2.78k | £3.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.12k | £4.44k | £6.74k | £19.11k | £3.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/02/1984 AS AMENDED ON 06/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 18/08/2013 as amended on 17 Nov 2020 as amended on 17 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
(I) THE ACQUISITION, CONSTRUCTION, EXTENSION, IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, FITTING OUT AND FURNISHING OF BUILDINGS AND PROPERTY TO BE USED FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE OCTAGON. (II) ADDITIONALLY TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS, CULTURAL, HISTORIC AND CHARITABLE WORKS AND EVENTS IN ORDER TO ENCOURAGE PEOPLES' INTEREST IN AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE CHURCH AND ITS OVERALL PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF UP MARDEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HUCKSHOLT FARM HOUSE
COMPTON
CHICHESTER
PO18 9NS
- Phone:
- 07768642431
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window