NATIONAL GREAT DANE RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NGDR relieves the suffering of Great Danes in need of care and attention; by seeking to provide and maintain rescue homes or other facilities for their care and treatment, then seek to secure new and appropriate homes for these Great Danes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 May 1984: Standard registration
- 22 February 2023: Funds received from 1102041 GREAT DANE CARE CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN ELIZABETH ANN TARRY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christine Weston | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLA HOOD | Trustee | 24 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
CORAL WEAVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ANDY ALEXANDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.51k | £7.75k | £34.26k | £16.57k | £19.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.06k | £3.82k | £27.04k | £16.50k | £17.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/03/1984 AS AMENDED ON 01/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 30/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 25/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 07 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE NGDR IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF GREAT DANES IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH GREAT DANES. NGDR WILL THEN SEEK TO SECURE NEW AND APPROPRIATE HOMES FOR THESE GREAT DANES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUMSEY FARMHOUSE
BLACK DOG
CALNE
SN11 0LX
- Phone:
- 01249816167
- Email:
- mail@ngdr.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window