Financial history MUNDESLEY AND DISTRICT RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 289400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.98k £14.00k £19.59k £6.24k £8.13k
Total expenditure £7.12k £10.65k £14.15k £4.95k £11.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.00k £9.48k N/A N/A