FORUM FOR ACCESS AND CONTINUING EDUCATION (FACE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FACE IS AN ACTIVE MULTI-SECTOR PRACTITIONER NETWORK FOR THOSE INVOLVED WITH ACCESS, CONTINUING EDUCATION AND LIFELONG LEARNING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 May 1984: Standard registration
- FACE (Working name)
- FORUM FOR ACCESS AND CONTINUING EDUCATION (Working name)
- FORUM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF CONTINUING EDUCATION (FACE) (Previous name)
- POLYTECHNIC ASSOCIATION FOR CONTINUING EDUCATION ('PACE') (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Andrew Ross | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Gino Carlo Graziano | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wendy Fowle | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.70k | £5.68k | £7.07k | £13.56k | £32.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.08k | £11.07k | £11.37k | £30.48k | £20.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DECEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF FACE SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF CONTINUING EDUCATION WITH SPECIFIC REFERENCE TO CONTINUING EDUCATION IN THE UNIVERSITY AND COLLEGE SECTOR AND RELATED CONTEXTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (A) TO PROMOTE COLLABORATION AND INNOVATION BETWEEN PROVIDERS IN DEVELOPMENTS RELATING TO CONTINUING EDUCATION (B) TO FACILITATE THE EXCHANGE AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION AND PRACTICES ABOUT CONTINUING EDUCATION (C) TO PARTICIPATE WITH OTHER BODIES IN DISCUSSIONS OF COMMON CONCERN (D) TO ENCOURAGE THE INITIATION OF FURTHER PROGRAMMES OF CONTINUING EDUCATION WITHIN OR THROUGH THE AEGIS OF THE MEMBERS OF FACE (E) TO PROVIDE A FOCUS FOR THE NATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND POLICY IN THE FIELD (F) TO ORGANISE APPROPRIATE ACTIVITIES: SUCH AS CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS AND PUBLISH NEWSLETTERS AND OCCASIONAL PAPERS AND ANY SUCH ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
University House
Bishop's Road
Peterborough
PE1 5BW
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- treasurer@face.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window