MAIDENHEAD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We meet once a week to learn choral works with the help of a professional conductor and pianist. We aim to perform two or three concerts each year for the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 21 May 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Hirst | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Antony Baker | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Turner | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Braithwaite | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ray | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sherrill Phillip | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine del Campo | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Harrison | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARYLIN OLDMAN | Trustee | 08 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CADEAUX | Trustee | 08 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.42k | £2.13k | £7.57k | £11.68k | £7.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.72k | £548 | £9.79k | £12.49k | £7.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 May 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 June 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED IN 1972 AS AMENDED 16TH APRIL 1984
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THICKET BROW
BATH ROAD
LITTLEWICK GREEN
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 3QR
- Phone:
- 01628829646
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
maidenheadchoralsociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window