Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY AND ST JOHN, HINXTON
Charity number: 289416

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Hugh Peter Taylor | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Frances Steele-Corfield | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER LAKE | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev LYDIA SMITH | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Catherine Riley | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MALCOLM | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MERVYN RUSSELL | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Graham Smith | Trustee | 12 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.