HIGHGATE COUNSELLING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prinicipal objective is to maintain, without profit, a centre where any person in need can, if necessary free of cost, obtain professional counselling with personal problems of all kinds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Haringey
Governance
- 18 May 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Cobill | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Finch | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Alexander Nicolaides | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheena Fawcett | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN RADFORD | Trustee | 03 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
VIVIEN WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Janet Muriel Seargeant | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.40k | £262.71k | £306.00k | £329.55k | £370.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £272.73k | £266.29k | £297.06k | £279.46k | £344.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18TH JANUARY 1989
Charitable objects
TO CONDUCT AND MAINTAIN A CENTRE WITHOUT A PROFIT WHERE ANY PERSON IN NEED CAN FREE OF COST OBTAIN COUNSEL, ADVICE, COMFORT AND HELP WITH PERSONAL PROBLEMS OF ALL KINDS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highgate Counselling Centre
58a Highgate High Street
LONDON
N6 5HX
- Phone:
- 02088835427
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window