NORTHBOURNE PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parish Hall provides facilities for members from the local community & surrounding areas to meet for the benefit of both educational & social purposes. There is a wide range of activities carried out including Art classes, dog training , mother & toddler group, gardening club, clock repairing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 22 May 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalie Christie | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Hayward | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Hubble | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Barrell | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madelaine Cook | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELOISE THOMPSON | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN HICKIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PENNY BEARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN MARTYN DENNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN SEMPLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.30k | £11.38k | £7.70k | £11.03k | £16.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.21k | £6.28k | £6.48k | £10.10k | £12.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS O THE PARISH OF NORTHBOURNE IN THE COUNTY OF KENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETNGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NORTHBOURNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
YE POUNDE HOUSE
THE STREET
NORTHBOURNE
DEAL
CT14 0LG
- Phone:
- 01304374975
- Email:
- ian.denne@toucansurf.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window