Financial history RADIO MOUNT VERNON

Charity number: 289445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £3.46k £2.16k £2.72k £1.14k £2.66k
Total expenditure £2.62k £2.37k £5.02k £1.83k £3.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A