THE BOWERMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The music room is used for concerts of classical music and is made available to other charitable organisations. The art gallery facilitates the exhibition to the public of the charity's portfolio of fine art. The conference centre is made available to church and discussion groups. A campsite is made available for youth work. Consideration is given to applications for charitable donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 May 1984: Standard registration
- THE BOWERMAN MEMORIAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET MARY TAYLOR | Chair |
|
||||||
CLARICE MARY BOWERMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHARINE EMMA BOWERMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULYAN MELVILLE CAPPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNA MARGARET DOWNHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Michael Follis | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £348.61k | £363.13k | £339.37k | £419.23k | £373.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £730.70k | £547.30k | £617.04k | £799.55k | £882.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2020
(These accounts |
14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 FEB 1984 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 29 DEC 2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11 JUN 2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 OCT 2013
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES ASSOCIATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHAMPS HILL
WALTHAM PARK ROAD
COLDWALTHAM
PULBOROUGH
RH20 1LY
- Phone:
- 01798831205
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window