Financial history NICHOLAS DE YONG'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 289481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £6.97k £5.21k £6.24k £7.56k £8.76k
Total expenditure £1.55k £1.75k £5.80k £6.02k £6.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A