Financial history DOVER TRANSPORT MUSEUM SOCIETY

Charity number: 289484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £105.43k £63.15k £106.48k £73.48k £110.04k
Total expenditure £76.99k £58.41k £69.91k £66.48k £81.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £29.64k £63.72k £22.56k £2.30k