Trustees WORTH PARISH HALL
Charity number: 289486

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian William Austin | Chair | 29 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Martin Hart | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Anthony Clark | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARIE SIMMONS | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meghan Locke | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vincent James Mott | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Lambourne | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.