Financial history THE PROVIDENCE TRUST

Charity number: 289529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £15.40k £20.25k £13.58k £10.69k £10.68k
Total expenditure £33.55k £18.43k £11.24k £10.69k £10.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A