LONDON LYCEUM OF GREEK WOMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Company's objects and principal activities are to advance the education of the public and in particular of Greek Nationals in Great Britain by promoting the study of Greek art, drama, dance, literature, history, customs and traditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 July 1991: Standard registration
- LYKION TON HELLINIDON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PIGI SKINITI | Chair |
|
||||||
Eleni Asimina Papagiannopoulou | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicoleta Skyllas | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angeliki TASSOPOULOU | Trustee | 30 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Oriana Zambakides | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYDIA CHRISTINE PATERAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANITA WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KIKI HELLINIKAKIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS MARIA SKYLLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATERINA JEFFREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.58k | £17.27k | £4.07k | £27.65k | £51.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.56k | £20.40k | £12.35k | £24.57k | £31.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH MAY 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR OF GREEK NATIONALS IN GREAT BRITAIN BY PROMOTING THE STUDY OF GREEK ART, DRAMA, DANCE, LITERATURE, HISTORY, CUSTOMS AND TRADITIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HELLENIC CENTRE
16-18 PADDINGTON STREET
LONDON
W1U 5AS
- Phone:
- 02072241969
- Email:
- info@lte.london
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window