Governing document THE VANZA SOCIETY OF LONDON

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/06/1984 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 26/05/2002 AS AMENDED ON 13/05/2012 as amended on 11 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE RELIGION THAT IS THE RELIGION PRACTISED BY THE MEMBERS OF THE VANZA COMMUNITY SETTLED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BEING THE DESCENDENTS OF KSHATRIYA CHAKRAVATI KING SHRI RAJARAJESHWAR SOMVANSHI SAHASRARJUN, WORSHIPPING THE GODDESS SHREE HINGRAJ MATA AND SAE SHREE GURU GOPAL LAL JI MAHARAJ. (B) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY AND CULTURE OF THE VANZA RELIGION. (C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR AMONG MEMBERS OF THE VANZA COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND INDIA. (D) TO PROMOTE HARMONIOUS COMMUNITY RELATIONS IN THE WEMBLEY AREA AND IN OTHER PARTS OF LONDON AND THE UNITED KINGDOM AMONGST PEOPLE OF ALL RACES BELIEFS AND CULTURES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.