TORQUAY CENTRE FOR DISABLED AND HANDICAPPED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide accommodation and facilities for social, sporting and other activities for the disabled, either individually or in groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Torbay
Governance
- 11 September 1984: Standard registration
- TORQUAY CENTRE FOR THE DISABLED AND HANDICAPPED (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Patrick Tibbetts | Chair | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Timothy Cummings | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Susan Angela Cummings | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS MALCOLM WATT DOLLAR | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET SHIRLEY FORD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.54k | £1.50k | £2.98k | £5.77k | £3.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.92k | £5.36k | £1.57k | £4.09k | £3.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH OCTOBER 1958 AND DEED OF APPOINTMENT DATED 19TH FEBRUARY 1982
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS (BEING BRITISH SUBJECTS) WHO ARE DISABLED BY REASON OF SOME PHYSICAL DEFECT AND IN PARTICULAR (A) THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE TO PROVIDE A MEETING PLACE AND CLUB PREMISES FOR SUCH DISABLED PERSONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1(3) OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18A PRESTON DOWN ROAD
PAIGNTON
TQ3 2RR
- Phone:
- 07792 019191
- Email:
- abbeyhall@dollars.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window