Accounts and annual returns ROUSHAM TRUST

Charity number: 289631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 19 April 2024 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required