Financial history ROUSHAM TRUST

Charity number: 289631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.06k £4.68k £2.59k £2.59k £2.54k
Total expenditure £2.38k £2.38k £1.80k £1.80k £2.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A