ROUSHAM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees hold the capital and income and at their discretion apply the income or capital: A) For charitable purposes B) If and when the Trustees become the owners of Rousham Park, in the preservation for the benefit of the nation at large whatever of the historical, architectural and constructional heritage may exist at Rousham Park and surrounding estate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 13 June 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES COTTRELL-DORMER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James Harvard | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Francis Hamel-Cooke | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA EVELYN COTTRELL-DORMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.06k | £4.68k | £2.59k | £2.59k | £2.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.38k | £2.38k | £1.80k | £1.80k | £2.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH MAY 1984
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTESS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. IF AND WHEN THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE BECOME THE OWNERS OF ROUSHAM PARK, OXFORDSHIRE THE PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF OXFORDSHIRE AND OF THE NATION AT LORGE WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST AT THE SAID ROUSHAM PARK AND THE SURROUNDING ESTATE IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS (INCLUDING AND BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 290 (1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTY PLANNING ACT 1971) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL ARCHITECTUARL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
ROUSHAM PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Dower House
Rousham
Bicester
OX25 4QX
- Phone:
- 01869347110
- Email:
- ccd@rousham.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window