Financial history FOREST FORGE THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 289644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £138.28k £165.18k £165.33k £73.04k £369.03k
Total expenditure £179.11k £144.01k £180.82k £153.66k £228.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.00k £117.95k £117.83k £10.00k £14.75k