FOREST FORGE THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 289644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CHARITY'S OBJECTIVE IS TO PRODUCE AND TOUR THEATRE PRODUCTIONS AND TO PROVIDE A COMPREHENSIVE PARTICIPATORY CREATIVE LEARNING PROGRAMME.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £369,025
Total expenditure: £228,047

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset
  • Hampshire
  • West Sussex
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie FULLERLOVE Chair 01 April 2025
None on record
Jasmine Taylor Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
James Swyer Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
David Waugh Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
Lizanne Smith Head Trustee 10 July 2024
None on record
Victoria Briggs Trustee 10 July 2024
None on record
Michael Wilson Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £138.28k £165.18k £165.33k £73.04k £369.03k
Total expenditure £179.11k £144.01k £180.82k £153.66k £228.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.00k £117.95k £117.83k £10.00k £14.75k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
First Floor Pintail House
Duck Island Lane
Ringwood
Hampshire
BH24 3AA
Phone:
01425470188