Financial history THAMES MEDITATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 289655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £26.74k £25.71k £24.03k £54.11k £69.36k
Total expenditure £18.97k £14.85k £27.42k £31.73k £38.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A