Financial history THE ORPINGTON ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 289661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £963 £1.58k £4.39k £5.47k £5.76k
Total expenditure £627 £2.53k £3.32k £5.90k £4.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A