Trustees THE ORPINGTON ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 289661

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Griffiths | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jeremy Smollett | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Goldsmith | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Allen | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Worthington | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rafal Kaminski | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ramsay | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tony Sizer | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rose Hopkins | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Alford | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.