THE TORRIDGESIDE TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide recordings, on CDs and audio tapes, of local newspapers for blind and handicapped local residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 13 July 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN DAVID HALL-TOMKIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MIKE JOHNS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/06/2020 | 08/06/2021 | 08/06/2022 | 08/06/2023 | 08/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201 | £119 | £5.07k | £221 | £52 | |
|
Total expenditure | £524 | £269 | £669 | £821 | £199 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 June 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 June 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 June 2022 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 June 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 June 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 13TH SEPTEMBER 1983, AS AMENDED 18 SEPTEMBER 1994 AND 9 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS THE RELIEF OF BLIND AND VISUALLY HANDICAPPED PEOPLE (WHETHER REGISTERED BLIND OR NOT) AND FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES AND DISCS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Beach Road
Westward Ho
BIDEFORD
EX39 1HQ
- Phone:
- 01237471667
- Email:
- greley@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window