Accounts and annual returns JOHN APTHORP CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 289713
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 16 January 2013 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2011 14 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 17 June 2011 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2010 02 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 26 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 22 December 2009 On Time