ST FRANCIS' COLLEGE PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the School; engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils; engaging in activities with parents and pupils of the school to raise funds for other children's charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 29 June 1984: Standard registration
- ST FRANCIS' COLLEGE PREPARATORY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Srinivasan Aravindan | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andreia Vanessa Lopes de Almeida Soares Cruz | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.84k | £6.99k | £6.47k | £5.18k | £4.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.44k | £9.27k | £5.10k | £4.82k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 February 2023 | 252 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 December 2021 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED 18TH FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL, IN PARTICULAR BY - (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. FRANCIS' COLLEGE
BROADWAY
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY
SG6 3PJ
- Phone:
- 01462 670511
- Email:
- CONTACT.TEAM@SFCPA.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window