Trustees FRIENDS OF HOLY TRINITY CHURCH, MELDRETH
Charity number: 289736

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Birks | Chair | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Crosby | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Mary Williamson | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane O'Hagan | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Hayes Wallbridge | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juliet Draper | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Robert Alan Skeen | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Mitchell | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANN PROVE | Trustee | 02 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Price | Trustee | 14 May 1999 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.