FRIENDS OF MENGO HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Mengo are partners with Mengo Hospital, Kampala, Uganda Republic. Through donations, advice, visits, gifts and prayer, our partnership aims to extend our involvement with all those who are treated, work, or are trained at the hospital. Funds are raised from generous donors, largely in the UK, and allocation is decided through close communication between the committee and Mengo SLT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Uganda
Governance
- 20 July 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN ALEXANDER WILLIAM DALTON | Chair | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Clive Kennett | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MARTYN OLIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SHEKAMIYA KATONO MATSIKO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.43k | £17.43k | £20.56k | £83.54k | £30.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.47k | £93.66k | £131 | £31.80k | £70.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH JUNE 1984
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN UGANDA PARTICULARLY MENGO HOSPITAL. B) THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AND SURGICAL ADVICE AND AID AND MEDICAL OF TRAINING FOR NURSES MIDWIVES AND OTHER MEDICAL WORKERS IN THE PREVENTION AND CURE OF DISEASE.
Area of benefit
UGANDA
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 LONDON ROAD
GREAT SHELFORD
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 5DD
- Phone:
- 01223844479
- Email:
- oliver47@virginmedia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window