THE FRIENDS OF ARKESDEN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for Church e. g. Calendars, Christmas cards + musical shows etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Essex
Governance
- 04 July 1984: Standard registration
- 19 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Christina McLean | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allison Poultney | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARA EVANS | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.46k | £4.99k | £3.00k | £4.60k | £15.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187 | £3.65k | £2.18k | £260 | £5.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 18TH JUNE 1984 AS AMENDED 4TH JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
(A) TO MAINTAIN AND WHERE NECESSARY RESTORE THE CHURCH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, ARKESDEN AND TO MAINTAIN ITS USE AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP. (B) TO FURTHER THE PRESERVATION OF THE FABRIC OF THE SAID CHURCH AND ITS GENERAL MAINTENANCE.
Area of benefit
THE CHURCH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, ARKESDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Beehive
Wicken Road
Arkesden
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB11 4EY
- Phone:
- 07941980456
- Email:
- tinamclean03@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window