CREEKSIDE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The W.I. is a National Organisation and we are one of approx.36 Institutes on the Isle of Wight. We have a few fundraising activites a year, some for Charity and some to top up our own funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 26 July 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN PARKER | Chair | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lamplough | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Harris | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Pearson | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Kirby | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carole Barfoot | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Moore | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jo Jones | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Downie | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Howell | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Phillips | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Edwards | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.81k | £7.42k | £6.13k | £7.36k | £9.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.17k | £7.05k | £6.23k | £7.00k | £7.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 275 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 275 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 641 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 641 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1006 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1006 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1371 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1371 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1736 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1736 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Binstead Lodge Road
RYDE
Isle Of Wight
PO33 3TN
- Phone:
- 01983 564413
- Email:
- arthur.barbara@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window