Financial history THE BATH STONE QUARRY MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 289752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.97k £9.00k £5.15k £2.06k £1.60k
Total expenditure £11.11k £6.12k £9.19k £4.86k £3.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A