ACG LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Arts Centre Group exists to support and encourage Christians who are working professionally in the arts and media or those students training to work in these fields
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 July 1984: Standard registration
- 06 December 2018: Funds received from 1056648 CATALYST MINISTRIES
- ARTS CENTRE GROUP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William David Shaw | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Scott | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Blackwood | Trustee | 06 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rt Revd Alastair Murray Cutting | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Chris Norris | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Kay Melanie Harvey | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ANN BIRD | Trustee | 02 November 2006 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY EDWARD JASPER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.03k | £15.03k | £14.19k | £15.92k | £11.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.37k | £19.37k | £19.70k | £17.41k | £15.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 March 2025 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 June 2023 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 FEBRUARY 1982 AS FURTHER AMENDED
Charitable objects
TO STIMULATE AND PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY SUCH MEANS BEING CHARITABLE AS THE ASSOCIATION MAY DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
P O Box 2162
Hockley
SS5 9DF
- Phone:
- 07753 345164
- Email:
- info@artscentregroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window